WebStatistics: Public Company Incorporated: 1888 as Willamette Falls Electric Company Employees: 3,321 Sales: $889 million Stock Exchanges: New York Pacific Company History: Portland General Corporation is a diversified holding company whose main subsidiary, Portland General Electric Co. (PGE), generates, buys, transmits, distributes, and sells … Web2 days ago · PORTLAND, Feb. 10, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- On February 10, 2024, the board of directors of Portland General Electric Company (NYSE: POR) declared a quarterly common stock dividend of $0.4525 per share. T...
Salem Electric Board Room Archives - Oregon Utility Notification …
WebPortland General Electric's President and Chief Executive Officer, Director is Maria Pope. Other executives include James Lobdell, Senior Vice President of Finance, Chief Financial Officer and Treasurer; Jack E. Davis, Retired CEO, Arizona Public Service Company and 19 others. See the full leadership team at Craft. WebMay 4, 2009 · Portland General Electric is a regulated electric utility providing generation, transmission, and distribution services to 917,000 customers representing about half of all Oregon residents. The company owns (wholly or through joint ventures) a total of 3.3 gigawatts of gas, coal, wind, and hydro generation. iom day care standards
Isaiah Cox - Distribution System Operator - Portland General Electric …
WebNov 27, 2024 · PORTLAND, Ore., Nov. 27, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Michael Millegan has been appointed to the Portland General Electric (NYSE: POR) board of directors, effective Jan. 1, 2024. Millegan is the founder ... WebOct 30, 2024 · PORTLAND, Ore., Oct. 30, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Portland General Electric Company (NYSE: POR) ("PGE" or the "Company") today announced the appointment of … WebOct 29, 2024 · PORTLAND, Ore., Oct. 29, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Dawn L. Farrell has been appointed to the Portland General Electric (NYSE:POR) ("PGE" or the "Company") board of directors, effective January 1, 2024. "We are pleased to welcome Dawn to the PGE Board," said Jack Davis, chair of the PGE's board of directors."Dawn's considerable experience in … iom death certificates